IA SSB3050 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2119
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2413
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2413
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Reported out of committee as SF 2119.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Reported out of committee as SF 2119.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including amending the controlled substance schedules, removing certain references to marijuana, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including amending the controlled substance schedules, removing certain references to marijuana, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported out of committee as SF 2119. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2020 2:00PM RM 315. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Greene, Bolkcom, and Segebart. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SF2119 (Replaced by) 2020-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 658.
HSB609 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 277.
HF2413 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
HSB609 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 277.
HF2413 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3050 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3050.html |