IA SSB3149 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2462
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2351
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2351
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2351.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2351.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, remove ambiguities, and provide for Code editor directives.(See SF 2351.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, remove ambiguities, and provide for Code editor directives.(See SF 2351.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2351. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2024 1:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Taylor, J., and Weiner. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB645 (Related) 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2462.
HF2462 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
SF2351 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 598.
HF2462 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
SF2351 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 598.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3149 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3149.html |