ID H0015 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 10 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 10 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SALES AND USE TAX -- Amends existing law to provide an exemption from the sales or use tax for any fees associated with public records requests.
Title
Amends existing law to provide an exemption from the sales or use tax for any fees associated with public records requests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 8, 2019 Session Law Chapter 10 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:12 a.m. on February 8, 2019 |
2019-02-08 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-02-04 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-01-21 | House | to Senate |
2019-01-21 | House | Title apvd |
2019-01-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2019-01-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-01-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |