ID H0195 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to motor vehicle dealers and salesmen licensing to revise provisions relating to unlawful acts by certain manufacturers or distributors, to revise provisions relating to dealers' submission of warranty claims and to provide for application of laws.
Title
Amends existing law relating to motor vehicle dealers and salesmen licensing to revise provisions relating to unlawful acts by certain manufacturers or distributors, to revise provisions relating to dealers' submission of warranty claims and to provide for application of laws.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/08 | |
2011-04-07 | To Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-07 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-07 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-07 | to enrol | |
2011-04-07 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-07 | Sims | |
2011-04-07 | 65-2-3 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb(McCoy), Chadderdon(Chadderdon), Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs(Wheeler), Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Burgoyne, DeMordaunt Absent and excused -- Loertscher, Shepherd, Smith(24) Floor Sponsor | |
2011-04-07 | PASSED | |
2011-04-07 | Rls susp | |
2011-04-07 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2011-04-07 | 1st rdg | |
2011-04-07 | Rpt engros | |
2011-04-06 | to engros | |
2011-04-06 | House concurred in Senate amens | |
2011-04-06 | House Held at Desk | |
2011-04-05 | to House | |
2011-04-05 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-05 | Tippets | |
2011-04-05 | 33-0-2 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McGee, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Schmidt, Siddoway, Smyser, Stegner, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Bock, Brackett Floor Sponsor | |
2011-04-05 | PASSED | |
2011-04-05 | Rls susp | |
2011-04-05 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2011-04-05 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-04 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2011-04-04 | 1st rdg | |
2011-04-04 | to 1st rdg as amen | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt out amen | |
2011-04-01 | to 14th Ord | |
2011-04-01 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-14 | to Com/HuRes | |
2011-03-14 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-14 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-11 | to Senate | |
2011-03-11 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-11 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 62-5-3 | |
2011-03-07 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-07 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-04 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-04 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-04 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-25 | to Bus | |
2011-02-25 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-24 | to printing | |
2011-02-24 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-24 | House intro |