ID H0214 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 278 Effective: 01/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 278 Effective: 01/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide the use tax shall not apply to any use of a motor vehicle which is registered or licensed under the laws of the state of residence of a nonresident student while such nonresident student is enrolled as a full-time student in an institution of postsecondary education that is both physically located in Idaho and recognized as accredited by the State Board of Education.
Title
Amends existing law to provide the use tax shall not apply to any use of a motor vehicle which is registered or licensed under the laws of the state of residence of a nonresident student while such nonresident student is enrolled as a full-time student in an institution of postsecondary education that is both physically located in Idaho and recognized as accredited by the State Board of Education.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 278 Effective: 01/01/11 | |
2011-04-06 | Delivered to Governor on 04/05 | |
2011-04-05 | To Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-04 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-01 | To enrol | |
2011-03-31 | to House | |
2011-03-31 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-31 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-03-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-23 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-11 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-03-11 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-11 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-10 | to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-10 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 | |
2011-03-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-03 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-02 | to Rev/Tax | |
2011-03-02 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-01 | to printing | |
2011-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-01 | House intro |