ID H0224 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 279 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 279 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide where the commission hears an application pursuant to the Local Planning Act, the commission shall have a reasonable time fixed by the governing board to examine the application before the commission makes its decision on the application or makes its recommendation to the governing board.
Title
Amends existing law to provide where the commission hears an application pursuant to the Local Planning Act, the commission shall have a reasonable time fixed by the governing board to examine the application before the commission makes its decision on the application or makes its recommendation to the governing board.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 279 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-06 | Delivered to Governor on 04/05 | |
2011-04-05 | To Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-04 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-01 | To enrol | |
2011-03-31 | to House | |
2011-03-31 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-31 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-03-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-25 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-24 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-18 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-03-18 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-18 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-17 | to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-17 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 62-1-7 | |
2011-03-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-15 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-15 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-04 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-03-04 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-03 | to printing | |
2011-03-03 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-03 | House intro |