ID H0313 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SCHOOLS -- Adds to existing law to require the provision of feminine hygiene products.
Title
Adds to existing law to require the provision of feminine hygiene products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2023-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 35-35-0 |
2023-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2023-03-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |