ID H0334 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 306 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 306 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates an additional $10,620,000 for the Public Health Services Division in the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2014; and provides legislative intent.
Title
Appropriates an additional $10,620,000 for the Public Health Services Division in the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2014; and provides legislative intent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2013 Session Law Chapter 306 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:45 p.m. on April 4, 2013 |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-04-01 | Senate | to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-04-01 | Senate | PASSED -- 31-3-1 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-03-27 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-27 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-27 | House | Stevenson |
2013-03-27 | House | 55-15-0 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Collins, Crane, Dayley, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, Meline, Miller, Morse, Packer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Ward-Engelking, Wills, Wood(27), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Clow, DeMordaunt, Harris, Hartgen, McMillan, Mendive, Monks, Moyle, Nielsen, Palmer, Patterson, Shepherd, Sims, Wood(35) Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2013-03-27 | House | PASSED |
2013-03-27 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 70 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 0, read three times |
2013-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |