ID H0441 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2024 Session Law Chapter 68 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2024 Session Law Chapter 68 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
UNIFORM CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “drug paraphernalia” to exclude fentanyl testing strips.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of “drug paraphernalia” to exclude fentanyl testing strips.
Sponsors
House Judiciary, Rules and Administration Committee | Sen. James Ruchti [D] | Sen. Abby Lee [R] | Sen. Ron Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 18, 2024 Session Law Chapter 68 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 15, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-03-13 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-2-0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-02-21 | House | to Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Title apvd |
2024-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2024-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-02-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-02-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported out of Committee Misdirected, Held at desk |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |