ID H0520 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - U.C. to be returned to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - U.C. to be returned to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
NO PUBLIC FUNDS FOR GENDER TRANSITION -- Adds to existing law to prohibit the use of public funds for gender transition procedures.
Title
Adds to existing law to prohibit the use of public funds for gender transition procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | U.C. to be returned to Judiciary, Rules & Administration Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-02-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |