ID H0697 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Sections 1 & 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Sections 1 & 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to, repeals and amends existing law relating to revenue and taxation to establish provisions relating to levies for payment of certain judgments; to provide that the amount of property tax revenues to finance an annual budget does not include revenue from levies to satisfy certain judgments; to establish provisions providing that certain taxing districts may certify a budget request in excess of certain limitations for the purpose of paying a final judgment, to provide for certain conditions, to establish provisions relating to the application of law and the method of payment, to provide for rules and to establish provisions relating to a limitation; to establish provisions relating to an election; to provide that the amount of property tax revenues to finance an annual budget does not include revenue from levies to satisfy certain judgments and revenue from certain levies; and to provide that the county may also issue bonds for the purpose of paying a certain judgment.
Title
Adds to, repeals and amends existing law relating to revenue and taxation to establish provisions relating to levies for payment of certain judgments; to provide that the amount of property tax revenues to finance an annual budget does not include revenue from levies to satisfy certain judgments; to establish provisions providing that certain taxing districts may certify a budget request in excess of certain limitations for the purpose of paying a final judgment, to provide for certain conditions, to establish provisions relating to the application of law and the method of payment, to provide for rules and to establish provisions relating to a limitation; to establish provisions relating to an election; to provide that the amount of property tax revenues to finance an annual budget does not include revenue from levies to satisfy certain judgments and revenue from certain levies; and to provide that the county may also issue bonds for the purpose of paying a certain judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Sections 1 & 2 | |
2012-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 01/01/12 Sections 1-7 & 16; 07/01/17 Sections 8-15 07/01/17 Sunset Clause | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/30 | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-29 | To enrol | |
2012-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-29 | to House | |
2012-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-29 | Corder | |
2012-03-29 | 28-7-0 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McKenzie, Rice, Siddoway, Smyser, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Werk, Winder NAYS -- Fulcher, McKague, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Schmidt, Vick Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-29 | PASSED | |
2012-03-29 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-29 | w/o rec | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-28 | to Loc Gov | |
2012-03-28 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-28 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-28 | to Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-28 | No sponsor data. | |
2012-03-28 | 48-21-1 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barrett, Bateman, Bedke, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hartgen, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Luker, Marriott, Nesset, Nielsen, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Smith(30), Stevenson, Thayn, Trail, Wills, Wood(27) NAYS -- Barbieri, Batt, Bayer, Bell, Boyle, Crane, Hagedorn, Hart, Harwood, Loertscher, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nonini, Palmer, Simpson, Sims, Thompson, Vander Woude, Wood(35), Mr. Speaker Absent and excused -- Smith(24) Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-28 | PASSED | |
2012-03-28 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-28 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-27 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-26 | to printing | |
2012-03-26 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-26 | House intro |