ID S1114 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 130 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 130 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to wine to provide that the State Liquor Division shall be authorized to buy, import, transport, store, sell and deliver certain wine; to provide that the purpose of the specified law is to regulate the importation, distribution and sale of wines while reserving certain rights to the counties; to revise provisions relating to records regarding the import of wine into the state of Idaho and sale of wine in the state of Idaho by wineries, distributors and importers; to revise provisions relating to the right of the director to examine certain books, records and premises as may assist him in verifying the accuracy of reports.
Title
Amends existing law relating to wine to provide that the State Liquor Division shall be authorized to buy, import, transport, store, sell and deliver certain wine; to provide that the purpose of the specified law is to regulate the importation, distribution and sale of wines while reserving certain rights to the counties; to revise provisions relating to records regarding the import of wine into the state of Idaho and sale of wine in the state of Idaho by wineries, distributors and importers; to revise provisions relating to the right of the director to examine certain books, records and premises as may assist him in verifying the accuracy of reports.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 130 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-24 | Delivered to Governor on 03/23 | |
2011-03-23 | To Governor | |
2011-03-22 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-21 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-21 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-18 | To enrol | |
2011-03-17 | to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-17 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-0-2 | |
2011-03-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-14 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-14 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-02 | to St Aff | |
2011-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-02 | House intro | |
2011-03-01 | to House | |
2011-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-02-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-24 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-24 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-18 | to St Aff | |
2011-02-18 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-17 | to printing | |
2011-02-17 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-17 | Senate intro |