ID S1117 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 179 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 179 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SELF-FUNDED INSURANCE PLANS -- Amends existing law to allow the director of the Department of Insurance to extend the period for minimum surplus requirements up to 12 months if certain conditions occur.
Title
Amends existing law to allow the director of the Department of Insurance to extend the period for minimum surplus requirements up to 12 months if certain conditions occur.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 179 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-21 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-16 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-16 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2017-03-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2017-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |