ID S1178 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Signed by Governor on 04/09/13 Session Law Chapter 315 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Signed by Governor on 04/09/13 Session Law Chapter 315 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $3,289,100 to the State Treasurer for fiscal year 2014; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 26; provides for reappropriation authority for the LGIP Fund; provides guidance for employee compensation; provides for legislative intent regarding the use of funds spent on conference related activities; and provides legislative intent for the payment of bank service fees.
Title
Appropriates $3,289,100 to the State Treasurer for fiscal year 2014; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 26; provides for reappropriation authority for the LGIP Fund; provides guidance for employee compensation; provides for legislative intent regarding the use of funds spent on conference related activities; and provides legislative intent for the payment of bank service fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/09/13 Session Law Chapter 315 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/29/13 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-04-02 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-03-28 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-28 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-28 | House | PASSED -- 68-0-2 |
2013-03-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-25 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-25 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-1-0 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |