ID S1193 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 331 Effective: 04/14/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 331 Effective: 04/14/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends Section 5 of Senate Bill No. 1103 relating to child support to correct a retroactive effective date.
Title
Amends Section 5 of Senate Bill No. 1103 relating to child support to correct a retroactive effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 331 Effective: 04/14/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/08 | |
2011-04-07 | To Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-07 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-07 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-07 | To enrol | |
2011-04-07 | to Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-07 | Simpson | |
2011-04-07 | 66-0-4 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Block, Bolz, Buckner-Webb(McCoy), Burgoyne, Chadderdon(Chadderdon), Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs(Wheeler), Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Black, Boyle, Shepherd, Smith(24) Floor Sponsor | |
2011-04-07 | PASSED | |
2011-04-07 | Rls susp | |
2011-04-07 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-04-07 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-06 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-06 | rec d/p | |
2011-04-06 | Rpt out | |
2011-04-01 | to Com/HuRes | |
2011-04-01 | 1st rdg | |
2011-04-01 | House intro | |
2011-03-31 | to House | |
2011-03-31 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-31 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2011-03-30 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-30 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-29 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-28 | to Health/Wel | |
2011-03-28 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-25 | to printing | |
2011-03-25 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-25 | Senate intro |