IL HB0003 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Strikes a clause preventing provisions of ordinances from being invalid when they impose greater restrictions or limitations on the acquisition, possession and transfer of firearms than are imposed by this Act. Provides that regulation of the ownership and possession of firearms and related items are the exclusive powers of the State. Provides that a local government may not require registration, reporting of the sale or transfer of a firearm, or may not keep a firearms registry. Provides that any existing or future local ordinances or resolutions imposing any registration requirement on firearms and related items are invalid or void. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARMS- MUNICIPAL REGULATION
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R] | Rep. Lisa Dugan [D] | Rep. John Bradley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-001-000 |
2011-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2011-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2010-12-28 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mike Bost |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |