IL HB0004 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the bill, but adds that a school district shall pay to its contractors who provide educational support services to the district their daily, regular rate of pay or billings rendered for any e-learning day that is used because a school was selected to be a polling place. Provides that this requirement does not apply to contractors who are paid under contracts that are entered into, amended, or renewed on or after March 15, 2022 or to contracts that otherwise address compensation for such e-learning days.
Title
SCH CD-ELECTION DAY E-LEARNING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0584 |
2021-08-27 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2022 |
2021-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2021-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 114-000-000 |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2021-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Johnson |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2021 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-13 | Senate | To Executive- Elections |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |