IL HB0026 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Deletes the provisions concerning the payment of certain moneys that would otherwise be payable to purse accounts to wagering facilities if the total Illinois pari-mutuel handle on Illinois horse races at all wagering facilities in a calendar year is less than 75% of the total Illinois pari-mutuel handle on Illinois horse races at all such wagering facilities for calendar year 1994 (the recapture provisions). Effective immediately.
Title
HORSE RACING-DELETE RECAPTURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-07-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) - Referred to Gaming | |
2009-06-01 | Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Dan Cronin | |
2009-05-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-30 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2009 | |
2009-05-30 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2009-05-30 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-07 | Postponed - Gaming | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Gaming | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-02 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a) | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-042-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-02 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-02 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-04-02 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-04 | Home Rule Note Filed | |
2009-03-02 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-02-24 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2009-02-24 | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David E. Miller | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-18 | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 | |
2009-02-09 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2009-02-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-09 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-02-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2009-02-05 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-02-05 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2008-12-18 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner |