IL HB0026 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning valuation of wind energy property, provides that (i) for taxable years 2007 through 2009, "wind energy device" means any device with a nameplate capacity of at least 0.5 megawatts that is used in the process of converting kinetic energy from the wind to generate electric power for commercial sale, and (ii) for taxable year 2010 and thereafter, "wind energy device" means any device used to convert kinetic energy from the wind into electric power. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-WIND ENERGY DEVICE
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Sacia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2010-12-28 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 10-600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |