IL HB0035 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-15)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0225
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-15)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0225
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law. Requires the Department to establish and maintain a website known as the Illinois Accountability Portal. The website shall provide direct access to information concerning State employees and individual consultants, State expenditures, State tax credits, State contracts, and revocations and suspensions of occupation and use tax certificates of registration and professional licenses.
Title
CMS-ACCOUNTABILITY PORTAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0225 | |
2009-08-11 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-15 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins | |
2009-05-04 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-04-23 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy | |
2009-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter | |
2009-04-17 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-14 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Cronin | |
2009-04-06 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-01 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-03-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-03-26 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-03-20 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-20 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-03-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-03-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-02-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-02-09 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-02-09 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-02-09 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-02-09 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-02-05 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-02-05 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-05 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-02-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-02-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2009-02-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-02-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-01-30 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-01-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2009-01-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2008-12-22 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |