IL HB0046 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Isolated Confinement Restriction Act. Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Anthony Gay Law. Provides that a committed person may not be placed in isolated confinement for more than 10 consecutive days. Provides that a committed person may not be placed in isolated confinement for more than 10 days in any 180-day period. Provides that, while out of cell, committed persons may have access to activities, including, but not limited, to: job assignments, educational classes, vocational classes, meals, recreation, the yard or gymnasium, the day room, medical appointments, visits, and group therapy. Provides exceptions. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall post on the Department's official website quarterly reports on the use of isolated confinement. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2024, except that some provisions are effective immediately.
Title
ISOLATED CONFINEMENT RESTRICT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice; 007-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice |
2024-04-11 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-11 | House | Pension Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-11 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-11 | House | Judicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-11 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-11 | House | Correctional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-11 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed to Table Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Ethics & Elections |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-20 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Ethics & Elections |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2023-03-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2023-03-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2023-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2023-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2023-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice; 004-002-000 |
2023-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-8-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |