IL HB0056 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Farmer Restoration Program Act. Creates the Farmer Restoration Program Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used for the purposes of the program. Sets forth the responsibilities of the Department of Agriculture, including the adoption of a scoring process for evaluating applications for agricultural conservation easement grants. Requires the Department to establish the Farm Conservation Corps to provide residents between the ages of 18 and 29 from socially disadvantaged groups the academic, vocational, and social skills necessary to pursue long-term and productive careers in agriculture. Requires the Director of Agriculture to make available to the public annual reports regarding data on the recipients of the Department programs. Requires the Department to conduct research on the status of socially disadvantaged farmers, the demographics and status of farmworkers, and corporate land investment and ownership in the State. Establishes rulemaking authority. Defines terms. Makes a corresponding change in the State Finance Act. Effective immediately.
Title
AGRICULTURE-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Cyril Nichols [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] |
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-038-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-19 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 005-002-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-04-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
505 | 72 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |