IL HB0075 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that the tax imposed on receivers of motor fuel shall be imposed until January 1, 2025 (instead of January 1, 2013). Amends the Environmental Impact Fee Law. Extends the repeal of the Law to January 1, 2025 (instead of January 1, 2013). Effective immediately.
Title
MOTOR FUEL-IMPACT FEE-REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0161 | |
2009-08-10 | Effective Date August 10, 2009 | |
2009-08-10 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-003-000 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Revenue | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-036-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-20 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-03-12 | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2009-01-09 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook |