IL HB0077 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the State Employee Commuter Vehicle Registration Act. Requires each current State employee who has been employed by a State agency for more than 1 year to be able, within 60 days after the date of his or her one-year service anniversary with that agency or within 60 days after the effective date of the Act, whichever is later, to furnish evidence that he or she has registered his or her commuter vehicle with the State. Defines "commuter vehicle", "State agency", and "State employee". Effective immediately.
Title
EMPLOYEE-VEHICLE REGISTRATION
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Remains in State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Bost |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-03 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mike Bost |