IL HB0097 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Lowers the registration fee for motor vehicles of the first division, other than autocycles, motorcycles, motor driven cycles, and pedalcycles, from $148 to $120, not including surcharges.
Title
LOWER CAR REGISTRATION FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=97&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0097.htm |