IL HB0213 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, if the rate of tax is reduced because the State has exceeded the State spending limit, then, beginning with the first distribution to occur after the effective date of the reduction, the State Comptroller shall order transferred and the State Treasurer shall transfer each month from the General Revenue Fund to the Local Government Distributive Fund an amount equal to 1/10 of the net revenue realized under Act during the preceding month. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-LGDF IF RATE REDUCED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2011-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2011-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=213&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0213.htm |