IL HB0220 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall revoke the license or visiting permit of any person issued under this Act to practice medicine or to treat human ailments without the use of drugs and without operative surgery, who has been convicted of committing (1) any felony under the Illinois Controlled Substances Act or the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act, (2) a Class 1 felony under Sections 8A-3 and 8A-6 of the Illinois Public Aid Code, or (3) a sexual assault or other battery against his or her patient. Provides that the Department shall investigate any licensee upon notification from any law enforcement agency of a criminal complaint setting forth facts which, if proven, would constitute grounds for suspension or revocation under the Act. Provides that any law enforcement agency in the State must provide immediate notification to the Department when it receives a criminal complaint against a licensee under this Act that alleges sexual assault or other battery on a patient. Effective immediately.
Title
MED PRACT ACT-SEX OFFENDERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0484 |
2011-08-22 | House | Effective Date September 21, 2011 |
2011-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2011-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2011-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2011 |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Dillard |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2011-03-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Re-assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2011-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2011-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2011-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |