IL HB0305 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Trustees of Schools Article of the School Code. Provides that within 3 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act, all remaining Class II county school units shall, by proper resolution, withdraw from the jurisdiction and authority of the trustees of schools of the township and the township treasurer. Each school board shall, upon the adoption and passage of this resolution, either (1) elect or appoint its own school treasurer, or (2) enter into a contractual or intergovernmental agreement for these services. The office of township trustees shall dissolve upon the passage of the school board resolution or, if no action is taken, 3 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that upon adoption and passage of the resolution and the election or appointment by the school board of its own school treasurer, the signing of the contractual or intergovernmental agreement, or upon the statutory dissolution of the office of township trustees: (1) the trustees of schools in the township or townships shall no longer have or exercise any powers or duties with respect to the school district or with respect to the school business, operations, or assets of the school district; (2) all books and records of the trustees of schools and all moneys, securities, loanable funds, and other assets relating to the school business and affairs of the school district shall be transferred and delivered to the school board; and (3) all legal title to and all right, title, and interest formerly held by the trustees of schools in any common school lands, school buildings, or school sites used and occupied by the school board and all rights of property and causes of action pertaining to or constituting a part of the common school lands, buildings, or sites shall be deemed transferred by operation of law to and shall vest in the school board.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-003-001 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-04-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 426 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |