IL HB0357 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0636
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the FY2021 Budget Implementation Act. Provides that the purpose of the Act is to make the changes in State programs that are necessary to implement the Governor's FY2021 budget recommendations. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCURE DOMESTIC PRODUCTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-23 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0636
2020-06-10HouseEffective Date June 10, 2020
2020-06-10HouseGovernor Approved
2020-06-09HouseSent to the Governor
2020-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2020-05-24HouseHouse Concurs
2020-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 062-047-001
2020-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
2020-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-23HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2020-05-23HouseArrived in House
2020-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2020-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 033-019-000
2020-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2020-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
2020-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2020-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-23SenateAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
2020-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2020-05-23HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2020-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2020-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2020-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2020-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2020-05-20SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2020-05-20SenateLegislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
2020-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
2020-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2020
2020-05-19SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-003-000
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-14SenateWaive Posting Notice
2019-05-14SenateRe-assigned to State Government
2019-05-14SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-07SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 070-038-003
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-10HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2019-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-26HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-02-25HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-02-19HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-02-19HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-004-000
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3051710Amended CodeCitation Text
3051725Amended CodeCitation Text
305175Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=357&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0357.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0357eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0357enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0636.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0357ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0357sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0357sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0357_04102019_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0357sam002_05232020_011000C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB0357_05232020_011000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback