IL HB0386 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning parole services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0231
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-000
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-001-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Peters
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2019-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2019-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
2019-05-02SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-14-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=386&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0386.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0386eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0386enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0231.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0386ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0386sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0386sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0386_04112019_053000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB0386_05232019_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0386sam002_05292019_024000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback