IL HB0437 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that a taxpayer who (i) has an associate's degree, a bachelor's degree, or a graduate degree from an institution of higher education accredited by the U.S. Department of Education, (ii) has annual student loan repayment expenses, and (iii) is employed full-time in the State, or has an offer of full-time employment in the State, in one or more of the specified science and technology fields is eligible for an income tax credit equal to the taxpayer's student loan repayment expenses for the taxable year, but not to exceed a maximum credit limit. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TAX-STUDENT LOAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-01-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=437&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB0437.htm |