IL HB0886 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides for registration under the Act of a person convicted of a battery when the court: (1) finds that the battery was sexually motivated as defined in the Sex Offender Management Board Act; and (2) in its discretion requires the person to register under the Act. Provides that the trial court, in its discretion, may require a person convicted of battery to register under the Act if: (1) the complaining witness is 17 years of age or younger; (2) the offender is 21 years of age or older; and (3) the court finds that the battery was sexually motivated as defined in the Sex Offender Management Board Act.
Title
SEX OFFENDER REG-BATTERY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-02-19 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-02-01 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 150 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |