IL HB0927 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-21 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-21 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Illinois Insurance Code, and the Health Maintenance Organization Act. Provides that a policy or plan that provides coverage for hospital or medical treatment on an expense-incurred basis, may offer wellness coverage that allows for a reward, a health spending account contribution, a reduction in premiums or reduced medical, prescription drug or equipment copayments, coinsurance, or deductibles, or a combination of these incentives. Provides that "wellness coverage" means health care coverage with the primary purpose to engage and motivate the insured or enrollee through: incentives; provision of health education, counseling, and self-management skills; identification of modifiable health risks; and other activities to influence health behavior changes. Provides that the insured or enrollee may be required to provide evidence of participation in a program, or demonstrative compliance with treatment recommendations as determined by the health insurer or managed care plan. Sets forth requirements concerning (1) opportunities for participants to qualify for incentives, (2) alternatives for participants to satisfy applicable wellness program standards where it is unreasonably difficult due to the participant's medical condition, and (3) the ratio of the total incentive monetary amount to the cost of employee-only coverage. Imposes conditions on any rulemaking authority. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
INS CD-WELLNESS COVERAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-21 | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto | |
2009-10-05 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Amendatory Veto | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 117-000-000 | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2009-05-15 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Kotowski | |
2009-05-13 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance | |
2009-05-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Postponed - Insurance | |
2009-04-30 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance | |
2009-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-04-22 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Insurance | |
2009-03-26 | Fiscal Note Filed from the Illinois Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-24 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-24 | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Insurance Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |