IL HB1042 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0074
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0074
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Energy Efficiency and Conservation Block Grant Act. Provides that the Green Governments Coordinating Council shall be the State governmental body responsible for applying for and distributing any and all energy efficiency and conservation grant money pursuant to the federal Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007. Sets forth the duties of the Green Governments Coordinating Council with respect to those grant moneys. Effective immediately.
Title
GREEN GOVERNMENT-GRANT
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Mike Boland [D] | Rep. Sandy Cole [R] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] |
Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Karen May [D] | Rep. Michael Tryon [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-24 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0074 | |
2009-07-24 | Effective Date July 24, 2009 | |
2009-07-24 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Environment; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Environment | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-04-02 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-04-02 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-04-02 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-04-02 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-13 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-13 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-02-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May |