IL HB1063 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a prosecution for any sex offense may be commenced at any time if the victim was under 18 years of age at the time of the offense.
Title
CRIM CD-LIMITATIONS-VICTIM AGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0379 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2013 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2013 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 002-001-000 |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (CL) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-13 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary; 002-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |