IL HB1168 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 3:30 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
Pending: Senate Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 3:30 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rights of Crime Victims and Witnesses Act. Provides that except in certain medical examiner or coroner investigations, whenever a person's DNA profile is collected due to the person being a victim of a crime, as identified by law enforcement, that specific profile collected in conjunction with that criminal investigation shall not be entered into any DNA database. Provides that nothing in this provision shall be interpreted to contradict rules and regulations developed by the Federal Bureau of Investigation relating to National DNA Index System or Combined DNA Index System. Defines "DNA database".
Title
SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-03-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-03-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-03-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 513 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 202 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 202 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |