IL HB1207 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Illinois State Police shall implement a mental health support program for law enforcement officers who are suffering post-traumatic stress disorder. Provides that the program shall consist of guidelines for personalized care, physical exercise including yoga and aerobic exercises, improvement of posture, group therapy standards, improving flexibility, and restoring confidence, and guidelines to maintain confidentiality of information concerning officers suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder and prevent that information from being included in the officer's personnel file.
Title
STATE POLICE-PTSD PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1207&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1207.htm |