IL HB1253 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides that a sex offender or sexual predator who was not required to register under the Act before the effective date of the amendatory Act now has a duty to register. Provides for notice to those required to register. Requires that persons unable to comply with the registration requirements because of confinement, institutionalization, or imprisonment register within 3 (instead of 5) days after discharge, parole, or release. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
SEX OFFENDER REG-RETROACTIVE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 102 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 102 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 102 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0578 |
2011-08-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 102-010-000 |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 102-010-000 |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2011-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2011 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martinez |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Held in Criminal Law |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2011-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-025-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deborah Mell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 150 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |