IL HB1277 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that benefit or annuity payments to a member or participant in a retirement system or pension fund shall be suspended if the member or participant is indicted or charged by information with a felony and the board of the retirement system or pension fund determines that the felony relates to or arises out of or in connection with his or her service as a member or participant of the retirement system or pension fund. Provides that if the member or participant is not convicted of that felony, payment of the benefit or annuity shall resume and the retirement system or pension fund shall pay to the member or participant the amount of the suspended annuity or benefit payments with interest. Provides that if the member or participant is convicted of that felony, the suspended annuity or benefit payments shall not be paid to the member or participant. Provides that the amendatory Act applies without regard to whether the member or participant first became a member or participant of a retirement system or pension fund before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-FELONY-SUSPEND BENEFITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-170 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1277&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1277.htm |