IL HB1348 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that no later than July 1, 2024, each health plan and pharmacy benefit manager operating in this State shall, upon request of a covered individual, his or her health care provider, or an authorized third party on his or her behalf, furnish specified cost, benefit, and coverage data to the covered individual, his or her health care provider, or the third party of his or her choosing and shall ensure that the data is: (1) current no later than one business day after any change is made; (2) provided in real time; and (3) in a format that is easily accessible to the covered individual or, in the case of his or her health care provider, through an electronic health records system. Provides that the format of the request shall use specified industry content and transport standards. Provides that a facsimile is not an acceptable electronic format. Provides that upon request, specified data shall be provided for any drug covered under the covered individual's health plan. Makes other changes. Defines terms.
Title
INS-HEALTH PLAN BENEFIT DATA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 008-001-000 |
2023-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 513b7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1348&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1348.htm |