IL HB1365 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Truth in Taxation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that the Truth in Taxation Law does not apply to taxing districts that are subject to the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law.
Title
TRUTH IN TX-PTELL NOT INCLUDED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |