IL HB1370 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. In provisions concerning the aggregation of retail electrical load of residential and small commercial retail customers by municipalities and counties, provides that any aggregation program that operates as an opt-out program shall apply solely to residential and small commercial retail customers that are taking service from the electric utility through fixed-price bundled service tariffs. Provides that the corporate authorities or the county board shall allow new residents outside of an opt-out period and non-applicable residential and small commercial retail customers who were not eligible to receive the opt-out notice to affirmatively commit to the terms and conditions of an opt-out program at any time during the length of the program under a process disclosed in the plan of operation and governance. Sets forth provisions concerning the plan of operation and governance for an opt-out program. Sets forth provisions concerning requests made by the corporate authorities or the county board in the aggregate area for certain information from the electric utility related to applicable residential and small commercial retail customers in the aggregate area. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall adopt rules to implement the provisions of the amendatory Act, including, but not limited to, protection of customers already under contract with an alternative retail electric supplier, utility processes for enrollment of opt-out customers, minimum disclosure requirements for opt-out aggregation programs and licensing of municipalities. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
POWER AGENCY - RETAIL CUSTOMER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-03-07 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-92 | Amended Code | Citation Text |