IL HB1370 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Large Event Waste Law. Amends the Solid Waste Planning and Recycling Act. Provides that, on and after January 1, 2025, an owner or operator of an event facility that has a maximum legal capacity or occupancy of at least 3,500 persons shall provide for (i) the recycling of items, including, but not limited to, glass, aluminum cans, cardboard, paper, and plastic beverage cups or bottles that are generated at a public meeting or public event held at the event facility, (ii) the transfer of these recyclable materials to a recycling center for processing, and (iii) the composting of organic waste. Defines "event facility".
Title
SOLID WASTE-EVENT FACILITIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-023-000 |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 017-008-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 017-008-000 |
2023-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 026-000-000 |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |