IL HB1458 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0491
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0491
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Changes the definition of "renewable energy resources" to include biogas and biosolids produced by municipal wastewater treatment plants in the State. Effective immediately.
Title
POWER AGENCY-RENEWABLE ENERGY
Sponsors
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Rep. Karen May [D] | Rep. Dave Winters [R] | Sen. Edward Maloney [D] |
Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0491 |
2011-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2011 |
2011-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-000-001 |
2011-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2011-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Cunningham |
2011-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2011-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2011 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy; 014-000-000 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-001 |
2011-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 018-000-000 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment & Energy Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy Committee |
2011-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Cunningham |
2011-03-07 | House | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |