IL HB1474 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides for specified rights of complainants under the Act. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
ETHICS-RIGHTS OF COMPLAINANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Constitutional Law Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-02-20 | House | To Constitutional Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |