IL HB1567 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that notwithstanding any provision to the contrary, medical assistance recipients utilizing emergency rooms for non-emergency services shall be required to pay the maximum co-payment permitted by federal law. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-CO-PAYMENTS-NON-EMERGENCY
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | House | Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-03-17 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2011-03-15 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1567&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1567.htm |