IL HB1581 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Creates a new violation for drivers that operate a motor vehicles while holding an animal in their lap. Makes violating this Section a petty offense with a fine not to exceed $25. Prevents law enforcement officers from stopping or searching vehicles for violations or suspected violations of this Section.
Title
ANIMALS IN LAP WHILE DRIVING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-03-08 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-08 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-002-000 |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1432 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 108-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |