IL HB1636 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that businesses that intend to establish a new qualified hydroponics facility or expand production at an existing qualified hydroponics facility to engage in the practice of hydroponics are considered high impact businesses. Define terms. Effective immediately.
Title
ENTERPRISE ZONE-HYDROPONICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 655 | 5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1636&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1636.htm |