IL HB2029 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that "survivor" includes a person who would be receiving an annuity as a survivor of an annuitant except that the annuitant elected to receive an accelerated pension benefit payment. Provides that "TRS benefit recipient" includes a person who would be receiving a monthly benefit or retirement annuity under the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code except that the benefit recipient elected to receive an accelerated pension benefit payment under that Article in lieu of receiving an annuity. Provides that "community college benefit recipient" includes a person who would be receiving a monthly survivor's annuity or retirement annuity under the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code except that the benefit recipient elected to receive an accelerated pension benefit payment under that Article in lieu of receiving an annuity. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE EMPLOYEE GROUP INSURANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-17HouseArrived in House
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Government Accountability and Pensions; 009-000-000
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2019-04-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53753Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback