IL HB2051 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Resections a Section concerning boards of trustees. Provides for the election of board of trustee members by trustee district rather than at large in Community College District No. 502 (College of DuPage), with a 4-year (instead of a 6-year) term. Makes related changes.
Title
COM COL TRUSTEE DIST-DUPAGE
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Reboletti [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] | Rep. Franco Coladipietro [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Rep. Harry Ramey [R] | Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] | Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] | Sen. Carole Pankau [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ron Sandack |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-004-002 |
2011-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 008-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-003-000 |
2011-02-23 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |